Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Metcon Ti, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Patricia E Walsh, against Green Spoke Property Management Inc., Et Al., Kitty Hawk Corporation, Your, Llc, represented by Jeffrey M Chu, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Peter H. Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter H. Kirwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
This complaint is filed by METCON TI, INC. against GREEN SPOKE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC., YOUR LLC, KITTY HAWK CORPORATION, and Does 1-100. METCON TI, INC. alleges that it is owed a sum of at least $25,806.28 by the defendants for labor, materials, eq...
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: October 01, 2021Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: June 30, 2021Application
Date: September 20, 2021Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 03, 2021Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 21, 2021Minute Order
Date: November 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2022 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 09, 2021 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) to complaint, atty Chu |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application Plaintiff's Application to Extend Time for Service of Complaint and Declaration |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice: Lis Pendens |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.