Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sherry A Glassman, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case against Safeco Insurance Company Of America, represented by George Avery Otstott, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Peter H. Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryPetition Re:Arbitration Award Unlimited (11) |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Memorandum of Costs
Date: October 05, 2021Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: October 18, 2021Opposition/Objections
Date: August 18, 2021Opposition/Objections
Date: August 18, 2021Opposition/Objections
Date: August 18, 2021Response/Reply
Date: August 25, 2021Brief
Date: August 23, 2021Motion: Tax Costs
Date: October 18, 2021Minute Order
Date: August 31, 2021Minute Order
Date: September 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2022 | Hearing |
Motion: Tax Cost
Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice 1-6-22 9am dept.19 Amended Notice re: Def's Motion to Strike/Tax Costs Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities 1-6-22 9am dept.19 Memo ISO Motion to Strike/Tax Costs Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion: Tax Costs 1-6-22 9am dept.19 Motion to Strike/Tax Costs Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF GEORGE A. OTSTOTT IN SUPPORT OF SAFECO???S MOTION TO STRIKE/TAX COSTS |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 21, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing: Confirm Arbitration Award
Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing - POS re: 9-21-21 petition to confirm Arbitration Award entered by Retired Judge Catherine Gallagher on May 22, 2021 - With the exception of Petitioner's request for prejudgment interest, the Petition to Confirm the Arbitration Award is GRANTED - signed by Judge Kirwan |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore re: Reporter Charlotte C. Roche - GRANTED by Judge Kirwan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.