Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Boneso Brothers Construction Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Vogt, George F, Jr, against Federal Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, S J Amoroso Construction Co Inc, represented by Leonidou, Janette G, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Boneso Brothers Construction, Inc. against S.J. Amoroso Construction Co., Inc., Federal Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, and several other defendants. The complaint alleges multiple causes of action, inc...
Proof of Service
Date: April 17, 2024RJN ISO Motion for Leave to File X-C
Date: April 17, 2024DEC ISO Motion for Leave to File X-C
Date: April 17, 2024MPA ISO Motion for Leave to File X-C
Date: April 17, 2024Notice of Motion for Leave to File X-C
Date: April 17, 202493420Subst0054f5
Date: March 07, 2024Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 03, 202100260703
Date: April 15, 202256363Proof00ac87
Date: April 18, 202200260703
Date: April 18, 2022Case Management Statement (00261180x9F7BE)
Date: May 09, 2022SJA's Notice of Jury Deposit
Date: May 09, 202257414CaseM008a97
Date: May 10, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: May 11, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: May 11, 2022SJA's CMC Statement
Date: August 09, 202261799CaseM00c808
Date: August 10, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: May 25, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: August 09, 2022General Denial, Filed
Date: April 18, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: May 25, 2022CMC Statement
Date: November 01, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: December 28, 202268679PLAIN013c2f
Date: January 04, 202368679CaseM009631
Date: January 04, 202371479CaseM00b70d
Date: February 25, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: February 28, 202378040CaseM006381
Date: June 27, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: June 27, 2023Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 03, 2023Notice of Case Reassignment, Filed
Date: April 05, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: December 28, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: May 09, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: January 03, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 15, 2023Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: May 10, 2022Complaint, Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: April 26, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: December 10, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: January 18, 2023Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 18, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: August 24, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: June 27, 2023Proof of Service, Filed
Date: April 18, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 28, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: November 16, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: November 01, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: August 10, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: November 16, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 24, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: February 24, 2023Summons Issued, Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: March 15, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: April 26, 2023CMC Statement
Date: October 17, 20238482211012000434
Date: October 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | RJN ISO Motion for Leave to File X-C | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | DEC ISO Motion for Leave to File X-C | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | MPA ISO Motion for Leave to File X-C | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion for Leave to File X-C | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | 93420Subst0054f5 | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CMC Statement | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | 78040CaseM006381 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.