Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Ward, Bob, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Koncius, Jeffrey A, against Instituto Espanol Sa, Midway Importing Inc, represented by Allender, Daniel L, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort (35) |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint is a class action lawsuit filed by Plaintiff Bob Ward against Defendants Instituto Español, S.A. (doing business as Avena Instituto Español) and Midway Importing, Inc. The complaint alleges violations of California unfair competition l...
Reply ISO Motion to Deny Class Cert
Date: April 17, 2024Reply ISO Midways MSJ or Adjudication
Date: April 17, 2024Declaration of Sara Bumby
Date: March 15, 2024Proof of Service
Date: March 15, 2024Declaration of Stephanie Taft
Date: March 15, 2024Plaintiff Opp to Def Motion to Deny Class Cert
Date: March 15, 2024REDACTED Declaration of Stephanie Taft
Date: March 14, 2024Proof of Service
Date: March 14, 2024Declaration of Sara Bumby
Date: March 14, 2024Notice of Lodging of Documents Under Seal
Date: March 14, 2024REDACTED Plaintiffs Response to Sep Stmt
Date: March 14, 2024REDACTED Plaintiffs Opposition to MSJ
Date: March 14, 202490062CaseM0088d1
Date: January 16, 2024Complaint, Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: October 22, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: October 07, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: January 19, 2022Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: November 16, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Summons Issued, Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: December 30, 2021Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer, Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Motion: Strike
Date: February 10, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: January 04, 2022Declaration of Demurring Party CCP 430.41(a), Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: January 03, 20225 Plaintiff's Objs to Defs' RJN ISO Demurrer
Date: January 29, 20223 Plaintiff's RJN ISO Opp to Demurrer to FAC
Date: January 29, 20222 Plaintiff's Opp to Defs' MTS FAC
Date: January 29, 20226 Plaintiff's Objs to Defs' RJN ISO MTS FAC
Date: January 29, 20221 Plaintiff's Opp to Defs' Demurrer to FAC
Date: January 29, 2022Instituto Reply ISO Motion to Strike
Date: February 04, 2022Instituto Reply ISO Demurrer
Date: February 04, 2022Instituto Reply ISO RJN
Date: February 04, 20222022_03_11 Answer to FAC
Date: March 11, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 19, 2022Answer, Filed
Date: March 11, 2022Objection, Filed
Date: January 28, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: February 03, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: February 03, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: February 03, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: January 28, 2022Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: September 20, 202161654CaseM00e6fb
Date: August 08, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: March 30, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 30, 202266980Joint0024d5
Date: November 28, 202280296CaseM007520
Date: August 08, 20232023.08.31 - Notice of Change of Firm Address
Date: August 31, 2023Opposition, Filed
Date: January 28, 2022Demurrer
Date: February 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply ISO Motion to Deny Class Cert | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply ISO Midways MSJ or Adjudication | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration of Sara Bumby | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration of Stephanie Taft | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Opp to Def Motion to Deny Class Cert | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | REDACTED Declaration of Stephanie Taft | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration of Sara Bumby | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Lodging of Documents Under Seal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.