Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Saucedo, Odilia, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Brown, Bradford D, Fenton, Alan H, against Trader Joe'S Company, Trader Joe'S Company Inc, represented by Bean, Heather M, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd (23) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Complaint for Damages, Filed
Date: September 13, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: January 24, 2022Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: September 14, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: September 13, 2021Summons Issued, Filed
Date: September 13, 2021Answer, Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: December 30, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: December 30, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: January 03, 2022Proof of Service, Filed
Date: December 30, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: September 13, 2021Notice of Association of Counsel
Date: March 01, 202255956STIPU019f02
Date: April 08, 202263105Stipu000faf
Date: September 07, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 24, 2022Order, Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Stipulation, Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Association of Attorney/Counsel, Filed
Date: March 01, 2022Stipulation, Filed
Date: June 22, 2022CMADRESS Early Settlement Session Report, Filed
Date: September 07, 2022Order, Filed
Date: June 22, 2022Order, Filed
Date: September 12, 2022Stipulation, Filed
Date: September 07, 202263432NOTIC000fdf
Date: September 14, 2022Notice of Continuance, Filed
Date: September 14, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: November 30, 202268631REQUE007e28
Date: January 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | 68631REQUE007e28 | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 63432NOTIC000fdf | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Continuance, Filed - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL, MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES (Comment) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.