Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mendez, Andres P, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Esparza, Luis, against Catalan, Jose, Catalan, Maria M, Lagunas, Guadalupe, represented by Kaestner, Jan Eric, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Santa Barbara. The plaintiff, Andres P Mendez, is suing the defendant, Maria M Catalan, for breach of contract. The complaint alleges that on March 7, 2021, a wri...
Amendment to Complaint, Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: August 26, 2021Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited, Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Complaint Contract, Filed
Date: August 24, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: December 15, 2021Amendment to Complaint, Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited, Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: January 03, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: December 16, 2021GGF 4.25.22 CMC Statement-All Defendants
Date: April 25, 2022CMADRESS Early Settlement Session Report, Filed
Date: April 11, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: March 28, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: April 25, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 28, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: May 09, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 03, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: May 09, 2022Maria Catalan SOA
Date: August 08, 2022G Lagunas SOA
Date: August 08, 2022Jose Catalan SOA
Date: August 08, 2022M Catalan 8.22.22 CMC Statement
Date: August 08, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: August 08, 2022Motion to Compel, Filed
Date: May 26, 2022img20220811_23441272 - Copy
Date: August 12, 2022Objection, Filed
Date: August 11, 2022Jose Catalan SOA
Date: August 12, 2022Maria Catalan SOA
Date: August 12, 2022G Lagunas SOA
Date: August 12, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: August 12, 2022JEK_CMC-combined
Date: August 12, 2022Motion: Compel
Date: August 15, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 15, 2022APM_CMC-combined - Copy
Date: October 05, 2022Summons Issued, Filed
Date: August 24, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: August 24, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: August 24, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: November 24, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: November 24, 2021Substitution of Attorney, Filed
Date: August 12, 2022Substitution of Attorney, Filed
Date: August 12, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 22, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: August 22, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 04, 2022Substitution of Attorney, Filed
Date: August 12, 2022Defendants 10.17.22 CMC_Statement
Date: October 08, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 07, 2022Catalan_11.21.22_CMC_Statement
Date: November 10, 2022MSC - Copy
Date: September 08, 2023CIV-110
Date: September 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CIV-110 | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | MSC - Copy | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Catalan_11.21.22_CMC_Statement | |
October 17, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: (1) Motion to Compel; (2) Case Management Conference
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion: Compel
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
October 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendants 10.17.22 CMC_Statement | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | APM_CMC-combined - Copy | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.