Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Fraser, Marcel, Fraser, Rebecca, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Baldwin, Samantha, against Calportland Construction, City Of Santa Barbara, County Of Santa Barbara, State Of California, State Of California Department Of Transportation, (total of 5) See All represented by Dawood, Christopher E, Watts, Joshua D, Zazzeron, Ardine, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd (23) |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint is filed by the law firm Maho & Prentice, LLP on behalf of the plaintiffs, Rebecca Fraser and Marcel Fraser. The defendants named in the complaint are the County of Santa Barbara, City of Santa Barbara, State of California Department o...
RFD - Filing
Date: March 01, 2024Complaint, Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: August 24, 2021Request for Partial Dismissal, Filed
Date: September 21, 2021Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited, Filed
Date: November 30, 2021Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited, Filed
Date: December 02, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: January 03, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: December 20, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: December 17, 2021Notice of Ruling, Filed
Date: January 03, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 20, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 03, 2022Request for Partial Dismissal, Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 24, 2022Amendment to Complaint - Doe 1 - Filing
Date: June 13, 2022CMADRESS Early Settlement Session Report, Filed
Date: May 26, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 07, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: February 07, 2022Amendment to Complaint, Filed
Date: June 13, 2022POS - S&C - CalPortland
Date: June 28, 2022Stip to Req Continuance Trial & All Associated Dates
Date: June 29, 2022Stipulation, Filed
Date: June 29, 2022COSB ntc entry of order
Date: July 08, 2022Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: July 08, 2022Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: July 08, 2022Ntc of Settlement - Filing
Date: December 01, 20232086490 - Notice_of_Posting_Jury_Fees_-_Fraser
Date: July 21, 20222086490 - Answer_to_Complaint-Fraser
Date: July 21, 2022Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited, Filed
Date: July 20, 20222115930_Ex_Parte_Applica_ontinue_Trial_Fraser
Date: October 17, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Summons Issued, Filed
Date: August 24, 2021Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: October 20, 2021Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Summons Issued, Filed
Date: November 02, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: December 17, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: December 20, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: June 28, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: July 20, 2022Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: October 17, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 18, 2022Ex Parte Order, Filed
Date: October 21, 202274241VOLUM02fe67
Date: April 18, 202374241DEFEN01071d
Date: April 18, 202374241Motio000590
Date: April 18, 2023CP Dec'l in Support of Opp to County MSJ
Date: July 14, 2023Obj. to Evidence re CalPortland MSJ
Date: July 14, 2023Memo of P&A re Opp to County MSJ
Date: July 14, 2023Separate Statement re Opp to Calportland MSJ - Amended
Date: July 14, 2023Obj. to Evidence re CalPortland MSJ - Amended
Date: July 14, 2023CP Dec'l for Opp to CalPortland MSJ - Amended
Date: July 14, 2023Memo of P&A tr Opp to CalPortland MSJ - Amended
Date: July 14, 2023CP Dec'l for Opp to CalPortland MSJ
Date: July 14, 2023Separate Statement re Opp to Calportland MSJ
Date: July 14, 2023Memo of P&A tr Opp to CalPortland MSJ
Date: July 14, 2023Separate Statement in Support of Opp to County MSJ
Date: July 14, 2023Obj. to Evidence re County MSJ
Date: July 14, 2023Decl_of_JDW_ISO_Reply_to_ortland_s_MSJ_Fraser
Date: July 27, 2023Fraser Reply to Opp to MSJ for filing 07 26 23
Date: July 26, 2023CalPortland_s_Response_t_tmt_JDW_rev_2_Fraser
Date: July 27, 2023CalPortland_s_Reply_to_MSJ_JDW_rev_2_Fraser
Date: July 27, 2023CalPortland_s_Response_t_dence_JDW_rev_Fraser
Date: July 27, 2023Stipulation to Continue Trial for filing 08 22 23
Date: August 22, 20231.2251255_Ex_Parte_Application_for_Leave_to_File_2nd_MSJ_-_Fraser
Date: November 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | RFD - Filing | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Ntc of Settlement - Filing | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | 1.2251255_Ex_Parte_Application_for_Leave_to_File_2nd_MSJ_-_Fraser | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation to Continue Trial for filing 08 22 23 | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
July 31, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Motion Summary Judgment
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Decl_of_JDW_ISO_Reply_to_ortland_s_MSJ_Fraser | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CalPortland_s_Response_t_tmt_JDW_rev_2_Fraser | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CalPortland_s_Reply_to_MSJ_JDW_rev_2_Fraser | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CalPortland_s_Response_t_dence_JDW_rev_Fraser |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.