Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Soledad Lopez, Maria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mckiernan, James, against Barragan, Caesar, represented by Gamble, William K, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Auto (22) |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 24, 2022SOLEDAD-LOPEZ Maria - NOS
Date: June 28, 2022Order to Show Cause, Filed
Date: May 03, 2022SOLEDAD-LOPEZ Maria - NOS
Date: June 30, 2022SOLEDAD LOPEZ - Dismissal
Date: July 15, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 07, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: May 02, 2022Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed
Date: June 30, 2022Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: August 20, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: February 07, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 21, 2022Answer to Complaint, Filed
Date: January 12, 2022Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed
Date: July 15, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: May 02, 2022Complaint PI/PD/WD Motor Vehicle, Filed
Date: July 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Failure to Prosecute Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | SOLEDAD LOPEZ - Dismissal | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | SOLEDAD-LOPEZ Maria - NOS | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed Unconditional |
|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | SOLEDAD-LOPEZ Maria - NOS | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause, Filed issued to Plaintiff's Attry - 8/15/2022 |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.