Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rodriguez, Jenifer M, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Greenblatt, Hank Gregory, against Mccay, Cameron M, represented by Luetto, Helen Marie, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2021 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is for personal injuries and is filed by Plaintiff Jenifer M. Rodriguez against Defendant Cameron M. McCay and Does 1 through 25. The complaint alleges that on February 23, 2021, the plaintiff was driving eastbound on 7th Street in But...
Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: January 24, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: November 23, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 08, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 23, 2021Association of Counsel
Date: March 09, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: May 18, 2022Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Demand for Jury Trial
Date: January 24, 2022Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: November 23, 2021Complaint
Date: November 23, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 23, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 03, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: May 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Deposit - Non Refundable | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement - Late Filed Case Management Statement - Late Filed |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney as to Defendant Substitution of Attorney |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Association of Attorney as to Defendant Association of Counsel |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury Trial | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Deposit - Non Refundable | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Summons as to Cameron M McCay Proof of Service of Summons Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.