Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2021 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
N_A_Nadia_Adams_signed_by_ELC_021022_1_
Date: February 10, 2022Answer
Date: March 15, 2022Decl_PAT
Date: June 23, 2022Pltff_Def_Donna_R_Vance_Trust_s_Exhibit_List
Date: August 16, 2023Pltff_Def_Donna_R_Vance_Trust_s_Witness_List
Date: August 16, 2023Pltff_Def_Donna_R_Vance_s_Proposed_Voir_Dire
Date: August 16, 2023Pltff_Def_Donna_R_Vance_ed_Jury_Instructions
Date: August 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Pltff_Def_Donna_R_Vance_Trust_s_Exhibit_List | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Pltff_Def_Donna_R_Vance_Trust_s_Witness_List | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Pltff_Def_Donna_R_Vance_s_Proposed_Voir_Dire | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Pltff_Def_Donna_R_Vance_ed_Jury_Instructions | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Decl_PAT | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited Party: Defendant Adams, Leah; Defendant Adams, Nadia |
|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | N_A_Nadia_Adams_signed_by_ELC_021022_1_ | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Date 2: 02/02/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.