Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Carpinteria Valley Water District, Central Coast Water Authority, City Of Buellton, City Of Guadalupe, City Of Santa Barbara, (total of 10) See All filed a(n) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate (02) case against Board Of Directors Of Santa Barbara County Flood Control And Water Conservation District, Santa Barbara County Board Of Supervisors, Santa Barbara County Flood Control And Water Conservation District, represented by Somait, Lina, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Geck, Donna D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Writ Of Mandate (02) |
Last RefreshedApril 13, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
Notice of Entry of Order
Date: April 11, 20242024.03.15 CCWA et al.'s REPLY BRIEF ISO MSA
Date: March 15, 20242024.03.15 Notice of Errata to S Hastings Declaration ISO MSA
Date: March 15, 20242024.03.15 CCWA et al.'s OBJECTIONS TO SBCFCWCD'S EVIDENCE ISO OPP TO MSA
Date: March 15, 2024SBCFCWCD Evidence ISO Opposition to CCWA MSA - Exhibit 9
Date: February 16, 2024SBCFCWCD Evidence ISO Opposition to CCWA MSA - Exhibits 12-20
Date: February 16, 2024Decl. of Matt Young ISO SBCFCWCD Opposition to CCWA MSA
Date: February 16, 2024SBCFCWCD Evidence ISO Opposition to CCWA MSA - Exhibits 10-11
Date: February 16, 2024SBCFCWCD Evidence ISO Opposition to CCWA MSA - Exhibits 1-8
Date: February 16, 2024SBCFCWCD RJN ISO Opposition to CCWA MSA
Date: February 16, 2024SBCFCWCD Separate Statement In Opposition to CCWA MSA
Date: February 16, 2024Decl. of Thomas Fayram ISO SBCFCWCD Opposition to CCWA MSA
Date: February 16, 2024Decl. of Wes Miliband ISO SBCFCWCD Opposition to CCWA MSA
Date: February 16, 2024SBCFCWCD Opposition to CCWA Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: February 16, 2024Summons Issued, Filed
Date: July 19, 2021Order for Publication, Filed
Date: July 22, 2021Answer to Complaint, Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Order for Publication, Filed
Date: June 24, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: October 22, 2021Demurrer, Filed
Date: August 17, 2021Proof of Service, Filed
Date: June 25, 2021Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Application for Order to Post Summons and Complaint, Filed
Date: July 20, 2021Application, Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Stipulation, Filed
Date: July 22, 2021Response, Filed
Date: October 22, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: October 22, 2021Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint 06.16.22
Date: June 16, 2022Somait Declaration
Date: June 16, 2022Demurrer
Date: October 29, 2021Notice of Ruling, Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Answer, Filed
Date: December 15, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 29, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Objection, Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: July 16, 2021Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: August 17, 2021Petition for Writ of Mandate, Filed
Date: June 18, 20212022.08.22 Petitioners' Non-Opposition to Motion Leave to File Cross-Complaint
Date: August 22, 2022Statement, Filed
Date: August 22, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Summons Issued, Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Summons Issued, Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Petition, Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Petition, Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Summons Issued, Filed
Date: July 16, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Petition, Filed
Date: July 20, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Petition, Filed
Date: July 20, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Petition, Filed
Date: July 20, 2021Proof of Publication, Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Notice, Filed
Date: August 13, 2021Declaration of Demurring Party CCP 430.41(a), Filed
Date: August 17, 2021Motion, Filed
Date: August 17, 2021Proof of Publication, Filed
Date: August 24, 2021Notice, Filed
Date: August 25, 2021Amended Petition, Filed
Date: November 15, 2021Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: June 16, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: June 16, 2022CCWA Cross-Complaint for filing 09 02 22
Date: September 02, 2022Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: September 02, 2022Motion: Leave
Date: September 02, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 02, 20222022.10.04 Cross-Defendants' Demurrer to District Cross-Complaint
Date: October 05, 20222022.10.04 Declaration of Marcus S. Bird ISO Demurrer to Cross-Comp
Date: October 05, 2022Demurrer, Filed
Date: October 04, 2022Declaration of Demurring Party CCP 430.41(a), Filed
Date: October 04, 2022Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer, Filed
Date: October 04, 2022Declaration of Demurring Party CCP 430.41(a), Filed
Date: October 04, 2022SBCFCWCD Opposition to Demurrer to Cross Complaint - 21cv02432
Date: January 13, 20232023.01.20 Compendium of Exhibits ISO Reply to SBCFCWCD's Opposition
Date: January 21, 20232023.01.20 RJN ISO Reply to SBCFCWCD's Opposition to Demurrer
Date: January 21, 20232023.01.20 Notice of Change of Assigned Attorney for CCWA
Date: January 21, 20232023.02.02 Notice of Ruling on CCWA_ et al's Demurrer to Cross-Complaint
Date: February 02, 2023First Amended Cross-Complaint with Exhibits_Part6
Date: February 28, 2023First Amended Cross-Complaint with Exhibits_Part4
Date: February 27, 2023First Amended Cross-Complaint with Exhibits_Part5
Date: February 28, 2023First Amended Cross-Complaint with Exhibits_Part1
Date: February 27, 2023First Amended Cross-Complaint with Exhibits_Part2
Date: February 27, 2023First Amended Cross-Complaint with Exhibits_Part3
Date: February 27, 20232023.05.04 CCWA Mtn for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint
Date: May 05, 20232023.05.05 CCWA Mtn for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint
Date: May 05, 20232023.07.13 Reply and Ntc of No Opp ISO Mtn for Leave to File TAC
Date: July 13, 20232023.07.25 CCWA Third Amended Petition and Complaint
Date: July 25, 2023SBCFCWCD Substitution of Attorney and Notice of Association
Date: August 01, 2023SBCFCWCD Notice of Association 8.4.23
Date: August 04, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue 8.11.23
Date: August 11, 2023Decl. of WAM ISO Motion to Transfer Venue 8.11.23
Date: August 11, 2023Decl. of ARH ISO Motion to Transfer Venue 8.11.23
Date: August 11, 2023SBCFCWCD RJN ISO First Amended Cross-Complaint 8.25.24_Part4
Date: August 26, 2023SBCFCWCD RJN ISO First Amended Cross-Complaint 8.25.24_Part5
Date: August 26, 2023SBCFCWCD RJN ISO First Amended Cross-Complaint 8.25.24_Part6
Date: August 26, 2023SBCFCWCD RJN ISO First Amended Cross-Complaint 8.25.24_Part1
Date: August 26, 2023SBCFCWCD RJN ISO First Amended Cross-Complaint 8.25.24_Part2
Date: August 26, 2023SBCFCWCD RJN ISO First Amended Cross-Complaint 8.25.24_Part3
Date: August 26, 20232023.08.25 Hastings Dec ISO Opp to Mtn Transfer Venue
Date: August 25, 20232023.08.25 CCWA et al.'s Opp to Motion to Transer Venue
Date: August 25, 2023SBCFCWCD Opposition to RJN ISO Demurrer of First Amended Cross-Complaint 8.25.24
Date: August 25, 2023SBCFCWCD Opposition to Demurrer of First Amended Cross-Complaint 8.25.24
Date: August 25, 2023SBCFCWCD Answer to TAC 8.28.23
Date: August 28, 2023202023.08.31 CCWA et al.'s Reply In Support of Demurrer to District's FACC
Date: August 31, 2023SBCFCWCD Reply ISO Motion to Transfer Venue 8.31.23
Date: August 31, 20232023.09.15 Notice of Ruling on Mtn to Transfer Venue
Date: September 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
March 29, 2024 | Tentative Ruling |
Tentative not yet posted, please check again.
Judge: Judge Donna D. Geck |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.15 CCWA et al.'s REPLY BRIEF ISO MSA | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.15 Notice of Errata to S Hastings Declaration ISO MSA | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.15 CCWA et al.'s OBJECTIONS TO SBCFCWCD'S EVIDENCE ISO OPP TO MSA | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.15 CCWA et al.'s RESPONSE TO SBCFCWCD'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO EVID ISO MSA | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | SBCFCWCD Evidence ISO Opposition to CCWA MSA - Exhibit 9 | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | SBCFCWCD Evidence ISO Opposition to CCWA MSA - Exhibits 12-20 | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Decl. of Matt Young ISO SBCFCWCD Opposition to CCWA MSA | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | SBCFCWCD Evidence ISO Opposition to CCWA MSA - Exhibits 10-11 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.