Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Martinez-Sanchez, Mario, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Leclerc, Mark Charles, against Terra X, Inc, represented by Terrazas, David James, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
Category(36) Unlimited Wrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
53060REQUE001a21
Date: February 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
February 05, 2022 | Docket Event | 53060REQUE001a21 | |
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non_Criminal Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
50661CaseMana00f4d1d Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Jury Deposit Document Filed |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
49456Noticeof008dddf Document Filed |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
46447SummonsS0149226 Summons Issued / Filed |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | 30 Day Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.