Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Boyd, Michael E, filed a(n) (02) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate case against Central Coast Community Energy, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
Category(02) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
|
Stipulation re 3CE Directors Officers and Managers
Date: February 01, 2022Stipulation and Proposed Order Re Briefing Schedule
Date: February 04, 2022Joint Case Management Statement (FU CMC on Feb. 14)
Date: February 08, 2022Notice of Lodging Administrative Record
Date: February 09, 2022Notice of Hearing on Writ
Date: April 04, 20223ce's Opening Brief
Date: April 04, 2022Notice of Lodging of Administrative Record - Volume 7
Date: April 04, 2022Declaration of Tom Habashi
Date: April 04, 2022Proof of Service - 3ce Opening Brief
Date: April 04, 2022Evidentiary Objections to Declaration and Documents of Michael Boyd
Date: May 09, 20223ce Reply Brief
Date: May 09, 2022Proof of Service - Reply and Evidentiary Objections
Date: May 09, 2022Proposed Order re Petition for Writ
Date: May 20, 2022[Proposed] Judgment
Date: June 09, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: June 16, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment 6-23-22
Date: June 23, 2022Proof of Service - Memorandum of Costs
Date: July 08, 2022Declaration of DJF ISO Memorandum of Costs
Date: July 08, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary and Worksheet)
Date: July 08, 2022Proof of Service - Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: July 12, 2022Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal with transcripts
Date: July 12, 2022Amended Judgment
Date: August 09, 2022Letter to Judge Volkmann enclosing Amended Judgment
Date: August 09, 2022Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment
Date: August 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Judgment | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter to Judge Volkmann enclosing Amended Judgment | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal with transcripts | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Memorandum of Costs | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of DJF ISO Memorandum of Costs | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs (Summary and Worksheet) | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment 6-23-22 | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.