Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryAppeal Of Administrative Decision |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
2022.02.24 Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 25, 20222022-06-08 (Paisley) Notice of Further CMC_Final
Date: June 08, 20222022.09.22 Joint CMS for CMC on 2022.10.06
Date: September 22, 20222023-03-22 (Paisley) Joint CMC Statement_Final (Hrg 04-06-23)
Date: March 22, 20232023.04.27 Pet MP's Sub of Atty
Date: April 27, 20232023.04.27 Pet MP's Notice of E-Service Addresses
Date: May 01, 20232023.10.18 Request for Dismissal of Appeal with Prej
Date: October 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.10.18 Request for Dismissal of Appeal with Prej | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Dismissal | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Petitioner Paisley, Martin; Respondent County of Santa Cruz |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.04.27 Pet MP's Notice of E-Service Addresses | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.04.27 Pet MP's Sub of Atty | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023-03-22 (Paisley) Joint CMC Statement_Final (Hrg 04-06-23) | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Petitioner Paisley, Martin; Respondent County of Santa Cruz |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.