Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Stevens, Curtis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Funk, Bruce C, Gill, Timothy, Short, Veronika, against Yeaney, Darrell Winston, represented by Hagan, Christopher John, Pierce, Joanne C., Werner, Joseph Alan, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
StevensV_YeaneyReqDism001
Date: March 18, 2024CurtisStevensCMS001
Date: April 21, 2022CMC Stmt 5.5.22
Date: April 22, 2022Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: July 12, 2022Proof of Electronic Service
Date: December 29, 2023Notice of Settlement
Date: December 29, 2023Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: August 31, 2022CMC Stmt 10.5.22
Date: September 09, 2022CurtisStevensCMS10_5_22_001
Date: September 12, 2022Ntc of Remote Appearance
Date: September 21, 2022CMC STMT 2.9.23
Date: January 24, 2023CStevensCMS001
Date: January 25, 2023Stevens21CV0203JuryFees001
Date: February 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Dismissal Filed By: Plaintiff Stevens, Curtis |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | StevensV_YeaneyReqDism001 | |
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Filed | |
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Electronic Service Party Served: Plaintiff Stevens, Curtis |
|
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Electronic Service | |
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance Filed | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Advance Jury Fee (Nonrefundable) Party: Plaintiff Stevens, Curtis |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Stevens21CV0203JuryFees001 | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Party: Plaintiff Stevens, Curtis |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.