Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Sedano-Mesa, Antonio, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Beltran, Sandra, Lyons, Elizabeth Anne, Rebong, Jonathan Bernardine, Uriarte, Arlo Garcia, against Seascape Resort Ltd., A California Limited Partnership, represented by Zaffos, Adam Phillip, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
Category(15) Unlimited Other Employment |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Sedano v. Seascape - Notice of Settlement
Date: March 06, 2024CMC-3.11.22-FILED
Date: February 25, 2022POS -3.11.22
Date: February 25, 2022POS
Date: March 08, 2022CMS
Date: March 08, 2022CMC Stmnt - 7.13.22-TO FILE
Date: June 29, 20222023_11_29_Sedano_Mesa_v___of_Attorney_FINAL_2
Date: December 06, 2023CMS - TO FILE
Date: October 01, 2022POS- CMS -9.30.22
Date: October 01, 202268478 Case Management Statement
Date: October 11, 2022684778 Proof of Electronic Service
Date: October 11, 2022POS- CMS -2.15.23
Date: February 16, 2023SEDANO - CMS - 2.15.23
Date: February 16, 2023Jury Fees - 05.08.23
Date: May 09, 2023Sedano - CMC 6.29.23 hrg - filed
Date: June 15, 2023CMS
Date: June 14, 2023POS
Date: June 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Filed | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Sedano v. Seascape - Notice of Settlement | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Party: Defendant Seascape Resort LTD., A California Limited Partnership |
|
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023_11_29_Sedano_Mesa_v___of_Attorney_FINAL_2 | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Sedano - CMC 6.29.23 hrg - filed | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Electronic Service | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Defendant Seascape Resort LTD., A California Limited Partnership |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Plaintiff Sedano-Mesa, Antonio |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.