Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Pettersen, Madasyn, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Wyle, Claude Armand, against Santa Cruz Seaside Company, Santa Cruz Seaside Company D.B.A. Santa Cruz Beach Boardwalk, represented by Colivas, Ashley Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi / Pd / Wd |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
DEF CMC Statement (for 3.30.22)
Date: March 15, 2022DEF Notice of Remote Appearance 03.15.22
Date: March 15, 2022Pettersen CM Stmt-signed
Date: March 16, 2022PL Request for Dismissal 09.14.22
Date: September 22, 2022Notice of Entry for Dismissal w POS
Date: September 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry for Dismissal w POS | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | PL Request for Dismissal 09.14.22 | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Pettersen CM Stmt-signed | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF CMC Statement (for 3.30.22) | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF Notice of Remote Appearance 03.15.22 | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
(CMC) Case Management Conference Notice Case Management Conference Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
- DEF CMC Statement 10.08.21 Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEF Answer to Complaint 09.29.21 Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEF Jury Fees-Trial Request 09.29.21 Advance Jury Fee (Nonrefundable) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.