Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nelson, Brooks, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Berman, Neil P, against Cco Socal Vehicles, Llc, Charter Communications, Inc., Kosinski, Artur, Spectrumpacific West Llc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2021 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
P-Mediation - Statement - Plaintiff.1
Date: June 28, 202265915Judic0095df
Date: November 03, 202265909Notic00f133
Date: November 03, 2022P-Notice Settlement.1
Date: November 09, 2022P-Request Dismissal.2
Date: January 10, 2023P-Request Dismissal.3
Date: February 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | P-Request Dismissal.3 | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | P-Request Dismissal.2 | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | P-Notice Settlement.1 | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | 65915Judic0095df | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | 65909Notic00f133 | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | P-Mediation - Statement - Plaintiff.2 | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | P-Mediation - Statement - Plaintiff.1 | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mediation Hearing
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | SF82716.3578031.Application and stipulation for order to continue mediation hearing 3.2.22 | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
(CMC) Case Management Conference Notice Case Management Conference Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.