Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Khp Iv Santa Barbara Llc, Young Brothers Construction Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gobel, Sevan, against Insight Enviromental Inc, Young Brothers Construction Company, represented by Giannetto, Alex M, Matian, Christina, Mayat, Natasha, Yukevich, James J, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Demurrer
Date: September 07, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: February 18, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: December 09, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: January 11, 2022Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: December 16, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: February 18, 2021Summons Issued, Filed
Date: February 18, 2021Case Management Order, Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: June 07, 2021Order, Filed
Date: December 17, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Cross Complaint, Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Notice, Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Notice, Filed
Date: December 10, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: December 21, 2021Motion, Filed
Date: December 09, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: January 11, 2022Summons Issued, Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Separate Statement, Filed
Date: December 09, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: January 18, 2022Amendment to Complaint - DOE 1
Date: January 28, 2022KHP - Plaintiff Case Management Statement
Date: January 31, 2022KHP - Ex Parte - Application and MPA
Date: February 01, 202252806CaseM00fa85
Date: February 01, 2022KHP - Ex Parte to Continue Trial - Notice Decl
Date: February 01, 2022KHP - Ex Parte to Continue Trial - Decl of AA
Date: February 01, 2022KHP - Summons - Insight Environmental Inc.
Date: February 03, 2022Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: January 31, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 02, 2022Order, Filed
Date: February 02, 2022Amendment to Complaint, Filed
Date: January 27, 2022Motion: Order
Date: January 25, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 25, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 31, 202256284NOTIC00a8ff
Date: April 15, 202256789CaseM0021f2
Date: April 26, 2022KHP - Plaintiff CMS
Date: April 26, 202257449DEFEN019d76
Date: May 10, 202257449DEFEN00f9b7
Date: May 10, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: May 11, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: May 11, 2022Case Management Order, Filed
Date: May 11, 202258915YOUNG008e1a
Date: June 11, 202258915YOUNG036fa7
Date: June 11, 202258915DEFEN0283d0
Date: June 11, 202258915DECLA066f82
Date: June 11, 202258915DECLA05e8c9
Date: June 11, 202258915NOTIC0134ef
Date: June 11, 202258915SEPAR0408fd
Date: June 11, 202258962NOTIC007a07
Date: June 13, 202258962YOUNG01a917
Date: June 13, 2022KHP - Plaintiff CMC Statement 2022.06.29
Date: June 15, 202259089CaseM00fd15
Date: June 15, 202259107CaseM00eb7f
Date: June 15, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 29, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: June 29, 2022job-6643435-affidavit-18502352
Date: February 03, 2022job-6618843-affidavit-18452404
Date: February 02, 2022Document, Lodged
Date: July 13, 2021Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: June 09, 2021Document, Lodged
Date: April 15, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: December 16, 2021Complaint for Damages, Filed
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Ruling, Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Demurrer, Filed
Date: April 15, 202160821DECLA01d23f
Date: July 23, 202260821DEFEN00b3e4
Date: July 23, 202260821DEFEN02cd31
Date: July 23, 202260821DEFEN034d15
Date: July 23, 202260857DEFEN005aeb
Date: July 25, 202261423DECLA018dc3
Date: August 04, 202261423DEFEN00221e
Date: August 04, 202261543DEFEN00f465
Date: August 05, 202261776Notic002beb
Date: August 10, 2022Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: August 15, 202262081DEFEN0059d5
Date: August 16, 202262081DEFEN02a253
Date: August 16, 202262081DECLA01e382
Date: August 16, 202262081DEFEN0350c9
Date: August 16, 202262081COMPE046cce
Date: August 16, 202262155DECLA0471f6
Date: August 18, 202262155KHPIV026f8f
Date: August 18, 202262155KHPIV00fc38
Date: August 18, 202262155KHPIV01222a
Date: August 18, 202262155DECLA0561f7
Date: August 18, 202262155COMPE031731
Date: August 18, 202262239NOTIC006b31
Date: August 19, 202262344NOTIC00f61f
Date: August 22, 202262471Decla002efa
Date: August 24, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: June 07, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: January 31, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: January 31, 2022Affidavit, Filed
Date: February 02, 2022Summons Issued, Filed
Date: February 02, 2022Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: February 03, 2022Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed
Date: March 24, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: April 15, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: April 26, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: May 10, 2022Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited, Filed
Date: May 10, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: June 10, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: June 10, 2022Separate Statement, Filed
Date: June 10, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: June 10, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: June 10, 2022Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: June 13, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: June 13, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: June 15, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: July 22, 2022Case Management Order, Filed
Date: June 29, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: July 22, 2022Motion to Compel, Filed
Date: July 22, 2022Document, Lodged
Date: July 22, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: July 25, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: August 04, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: August 10, 2022Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: August 10, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: August 05, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Objection, Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Separate Statement, Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Document, Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Document, Filed
Date: August 17, 2022Objection, Filed
Date: August 17, 2022Response, Filed
Date: August 17, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: August 17, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: August 19, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: August 17, 2022Document, Lodged
Date: August 22, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: August 17, 2022Objection, Filed
Date: August 26, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: August 26, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: August 24, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: August 26, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: August 26, 202262608YOUNG003ffd
Date: August 26, 202262608OBJEC01913a
Date: August 26, 202262608YOUNG037420
Date: August 26, 202262608DEFEN02b599
Date: August 26, 202262844STIPU00da96
Date: September 01, 2022Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: August 31, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 31, 2022Stipulation, Filed
Date: August 31, 2022Settlement Conference
Date: September 09, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 09, 202263324DEFEN006eb8
Date: September 13, 202263390Answe002edc
Date: September 13, 2022Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited, Filed
Date: September 13, 202267823COMPE0307dd
Date: December 14, 202267823DECLA011fff
Date: December 14, 202267823SEPAR023ef8
Date: December 14, 202267823DEFEN00ac5e
Date: December 14, 202268030Motio00dd16
Date: December 19, 202268030Decla019098
Date: December 19, 202269479DECLA01c35e
Date: January 19, 202369479NOTIC00c631
Date: January 19, 202369479MEMOR0273c8
Date: January 19, 202370258Notic007311
Date: February 02, 202371003Decla01604f
Date: February 16, 202371003Oppos005597
Date: February 16, 2023KHP - Notice of Settlement of Entire Case
Date: February 21, 202371296DEFEN008dc7
Date: February 22, 2023KHP - MTQ- Notice of Taking Off Calendar
Date: February 24, 2023Opposition, Filed
Date: February 15, 2023Declaration, Filed
Date: December 19, 2022Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Motion: Leave
Date: February 08, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: December 14, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: January 18, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 08, 2023Motion, Filed
Date: December 19, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 01, 2023Declaration, Filed
Date: February 15, 2023Document, Filed
Date: December 14, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: December 14, 2022Motion: Quash
Date: March 01, 2023Notice, Filed
Date: February 02, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: January 18, 2023Notice, Filed
Date: February 22, 2023Notice, Filed
Date: February 24, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: November 30, 2022Separate Statement, Filed
Date: December 14, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: January 18, 2023Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: November 30, 2022Trial Confirmation Conference
Date: April 05, 202377275Reque009be5
Date: June 13, 202377374Reque000e5b
Date: June 14, 2023Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed
Date: June 14, 2023Answer, Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: June 22, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Demurrer
Date: May 25, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: May 25, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: May 12, 2021Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: February 22, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: May 12, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: August 24, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: August 30, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer, Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: April 15, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: May 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | 77374Reque000e5b | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | 77275Reque009be5 | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Lodged Documents, Destroyed 06/13/2022--Exhibits 1-29 **HARD COPY** (NO SASE PROVIDED) |
|
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Lodged Documents, Destroyed 12/10/2021---Exhibits ISO Motion to Compel (NO SASE PROVIDED) |
|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed TCC: off calendar; case settled |
|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Trial Confirmation Conference Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion: Summary Judgment
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Off Calendar |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Motion: Quash Deposition Subpoena Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.