Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Robert T. Elliott, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Andrea Cruz Avila, Nina Michele Patane, against Mechanics Bank, A California Corporation, As The Successor-In-Interest To Rabobank, N.A., A California Corporation, Mechanics Bank, A California Corporation, Successor By Merger To Rabobank, N.A., Mechanics Bank, Successor-In-Interest By Merger To Rabobank, N.A., Rabobank, N.A., A California Corporation, represented by Matthew Scott Kennedy, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
2022-03-23 Request for Entry of Default
Date: March 25, 20222022-04-04 Proof of Service TO SERVE & FILE
Date: April 04, 20222022-04-04 Case Management Statement TO SERVE & FILE
Date: April 04, 20222022-04-04 Notice of Posting Jury Fees TO SERVE & FILE
Date: April 04, 2022MechanicsBank - NOM_Mtn to Set Aside Default_2022-4-14+EX+S
Date: April 14, 2022MechanicsBank - NOM_Mtn to Set Aside Default_2022-4-14+EX+S [POS USPS]
Date: April 14, 2022CMC Statement [Mechanics Bank]_2022-4-14 [Static]+POS+S
Date: April 14, 2022Answer - Mechanics Bank [Elliott v. Mechanics Bank]_2022-5-9+S
Date: May 09, 20222022-07-13 Notice of Motion - MSJ TO SERVE & FILE
Date: July 14, 20222022-07-13 Separate Statement ISO MSJ TO SERVE & FILE
Date: July 14, 20222022-07-13 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO MSJ TO SERVE & FILE
Date: July 14, 20222022-07-14 Proof of Service MSJ TO SERVE & FILE
Date: July 14, 20222022-07-12 Decl. of Robert T. Elliott ISO MSJ TO SERVE & FILE
Date: July 14, 20222022-07-13 Decl. of Andrea C. Avila ISO MSJ TO SERVE & FILE
Date: July 14, 20222022-07-18 Case Management Statement TO SERVE & FILE
Date: July 18, 20222022-01-06 Proof of Service on Rabobank
Date: January 13, 20222022-01-07 Proof of Service on Mechanics Bank
Date: January 13, 2022CMC Statement [Mechanics Bank]_2022-7-20 [Static]+POS+S
Date: July 20, 2022Elliott - Proposed Order on MB's XPA to Continue MSJ+S
Date: July 30, 2022Elliott - MB's XPA to Continue MSJ [FDoc]+EX+S
Date: July 30, 20222022-08-01 Opp to Ex Parte App to Continue MSJ Hearing TO SERVE & FILE
Date: August 01, 20222022-08-01 Proof of Service TO SERVE & FILE
Date: August 01, 20222022-11-17 Case Management Statement TO SERVE & FILE
Date: November 17, 2022Elliott - Def MB's Evidentiary Exs in Opp to Pltf's MSJ [2022-11-18] [FDoc]+S
Date: November 18, 2022Elliott - Def MB's Memorandum in Opp to Pltf's MSJ [2022-11-18] [FDoc]+S
Date: November 18, 2022Elliott - Def MB's Evidentiary Objections in Opp to Pltf's MSJ [2022-11-18] [FDoc]+S
Date: November 18, 2022Elliott - MB's SS Disputed_Add'l Material Facts [2022-11-18] [2022-11-18] [FDoc]+S
Date: November 18, 2022CMC Statement [Mechanics Bank]_2022-11-18 [Static]+POS+S
Date: November 18, 20222022-11-23 Reply to Def's Opp to Motion for Summary Judgment TO SERVE & FILE
Date: November 23, 20222022-11-23 Response to Def's Separate Statement and Additional Facts TO SERVE & FILE
Date: November 23, 20222022-11-23 Proof of Service MSJ Reply TO SERVE & FILE
Date: November 23, 20222022-11-23 Decl. of A.. Avila ISO Reply to MSJ Opp TO SERVE & FILE
Date: November 23, 2022Elliott - Def MB's Objection to Pltf's Reply re MSJ [FDoc]+S
Date: November 26, 2022Elliott_Def MB's - Proposed Order Denying MSJ [FDoc] POS+S
Date: December 14, 20222023-04-17 Case Management Statement TO SERVE & FILE
Date: April 17, 20232023-04-17 Notice of Remote Appearance TO SERVE & FILE
Date: April 17, 2023CMC Statement [Mechanics Bank]_2023-4-18 [Static]+POS+S
Date: April 18, 2023Elliott - Def Mechanics Bank's Evidentiary_Exhibits iso MSJ (F)+S
Date: April 21, 2023Elliott - Def Mechanics Bank's SSUMF iso MSJ (Final)+S
Date: April 21, 2023Elliott - Def Mechanics Bank's NOM_MSJ+S
Date: April 21, 2023Elliott - MB's Reply Brief re MSJ [FDoc]+EX_2023-7-14+S
Date: July 14, 2023Elliott - MB's Supp Brief re MSJ (FDoc)_2023-9-5+S
Date: September 05, 20232023-09-15 Proof of Service - Further Briefing TO SERVE & FILE
Date: September 15, 20232023-09-15 Pltf's Further Briefing in Opp. to Def's MSJ TO SERVE & FILE
Date: September 15, 2023Elliott - MB's Objections to Pltf's Evid in Opp [FDoc]_2023-7-14+S
Date: September 21, 2023Elliott - MB's Supp Reply Brief re MSJ [FDoc]+S
Date: September 21, 20232023-09-27 Plaintiff's Response to Def. MB's Objections to Opp. Evidence TO SERVE & FILE
Date: September 27, 2023Elliott v MechanicsBank - Memorandum of Costs+S
Date: October 18, 2023Elliott v MechanicsBank - (Proposed) Judgment+POS+S
Date: October 18, 2023Notice of Entry - Judgment_2023-10-26 [Static]+EX+POS+S
Date: October 26, 20232023-11-02 Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal TO SERVE & FILE
Date: November 02, 20232023-11-02 Notice of Appeal TO SERVE & FILE
Date: November 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | APP-010 Respondent's [Mechanics Bank] Notice Designating Record on Appeal [Static]_2024-1-2+POS+S | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice: Clerk's Notice of Appeal | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Designation/Transcript on Appeal | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023-11-02 Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal TO SERVE & FILE | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023-11-02 Notice of Appeal TO SERVE & FILE | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry - Judgment_2023-10-26 [Static]+EX+POS+S | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil) | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Elliott v MechanicsBank - Memorandum of Costs+S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.