Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Erin Smith, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Ashlee Elizabeth Gustafson, against Everbank, A Federal Savings Association, Magdalena Gutierrez, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Management Statement by Magdalena Gutierrez
Date: January 04, 20222022_03_15_Notice_of_Settlement
Date: March 15, 20222022_04_06_Request_for_Dismissal
Date: April 06, 20222022_04_12_Ntc_of_Entry_of_Dismissal
Date: April 12, 20222022_01_05_Smith_s_CMC_Stmt_re_1_25_22_CMC_
Date: January 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022_04_12_Ntc_of_Entry_of_Dismissal | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022_04_06_Request_for_Dismissal | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022_03_15_Notice_of_Settlement | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022_01_05_Smith_s_CMC_Stmt_re_1_25_22_CMC_ | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement by Magdalena Gutierrez | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.