Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Montanez, Jose Rocha, R. Montanez Farms, Llc, Santa Cruz County Regional Transportation Commission, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Riggs, Jennifer Lauren, against Kajihara, King, Kajihara, Steve, Kajihara, Terrie, R. Montanez Farms, Llc, represented by Donahue, James Richard, Furcolo, Regan, Lea, Christopher Michael, Schaffer, Todd Allen, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2021 |
Category(35) Unlimited Other Non-Pi / Pd / Wd Tort |
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Ruling at Case Management Conference
Date: February 08, 2024SCCRTC CMC for 2.06.24
Date: January 29, 2024CMC Stmt (012624)(SANrmo)
Date: January 26, 2024Case Management Statement 2.6.24
Date: January 24, 2024POS.CM Statement (2.6.24 hrg)
Date: January 24, 2024Answer to R. Montanez and J. Rocha's FAXC
Date: February 28, 2022[SCCRTC] Notice of Further CMC on Sept. 14
Date: June 22, 2022[SCCRTC] Case Management Statement for Further CMC on Sept. 14
Date: August 29, 2022CM Statement (9.14.22 hrg)
Date: August 30, 2022POS.CM Statement (9.14.22 hrg)
Date: August 30, 202209.14.2022 CMC Montanze
Date: August 30, 2022NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: November 14, 2022Notice of Further CMC
Date: November 17, 2022CMS
Date: February 02, 2023CM Statement (2.17.23 hrg)
Date: February 03, 2023POS.CM Statement (2.17.23 hrg)
Date: February 03, 2023Case Management Statement 2.17.2023
Date: February 03, 2023[SCCRTC] Notice Of Remote Appearance (Remote Appearance)
Date: February 15, 2023SF34015668 III
Date: June 16, 2023SF34015668 II
Date: June 16, 2023SF34015668 I
Date: June 16, 2023R Montanez Sub of Atty (060723)(SANmon)
Date: June 16, 2023SF34015761
Date: June 20, 2023[SCCRTC] Notice of Further CMC on Oct. 5
Date: June 28, 2023R Montanez Sub of Atty (062323)(SANmon)
Date: June 26, 2023CMC 10.05.23 (092023)(SANmon)
Date: September 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling at Case Management Conference | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Plaintiff Santa Cruz County Regional Transportation Commission |
|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | SCCRTC CMC for 2.06.24 | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Cross Complainant, Cross Defendant Montanez, Jose Rocha; Cross Complainant, Cross Defendant, Defendant R. Montanez Farms, LLC |
|
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | CMC Stmt (012624)(SANrmo) | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Cross Defendant, Defendant Kajihara, Terrie; Cross Defendant, Defendant Kajihara, Steve; Cross Defendant, Defendant Kajihara, King |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Party: Cross Defendant, Defendant Kajihara, Terrie; Cross Defendant, Defendant Kajihara, Steve; Cross Defendant, Defendant Kajihara, King |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement 2.6.24 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.