Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Marianna Clampett, Robert Clampett, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Daniel Hollingsworth, David M Hollingsworth, Robert H Roe, against Homesite Insurance Company Of California, represented by Barbara J Mandell, Matthew William Balmuth, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage Unlimited (18) |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order relieving plaintiffs
Date: December 31, 20212022.06.07 RA-010 Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: June 07, 2022s32941_rem_app
Date: June 07, 2022Declaration
Date: December 31, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: December 31, 20212023.02.01 Defs updated CMC Statement
Date: February 01, 2023Clampett_CMC_Statement_signed
Date: February 09, 2023Substitution of Attorney Robert Clampett
Date: April 17, 2023Substitution of Attorney - Marianna Clampett
Date: April 17, 20232023.05.16 MSJ - Index of Evidence Vol. Two
Date: May 17, 20232023.05.16 MSJ-Index of Evidence Vol One Part2
Date: May 17, 20232023.05.16 MSJ - Index of Evidence Vol. Four
Date: May 17, 20232023.05.16 MSJ - Index of Evidence Vol. Three
Date: May 17, 20232023.05.16 MSJ-Index of Evidence Vol One Part1
Date: May 17, 20232023.05.16 MSJ - Decl of BJM
Date: May 16, 20232023.05.16 MSJ - Memo
Date: May 16, 20232023.05.16 MSJ - RJN
Date: May 16, 20232023.05.16 MSJ - Sep Stmt
Date: May 16, 20232023.05.16 MSJ - Decl of Scott Callahan
Date: May 16, 20232023.05.16 MSJ - Proposed Order
Date: May 16, 20232023.05.16 MSJ-Index of Evidence Vol One Part2
Date: May 22, 20232023.05.16 MSJ - Index of Evidence Vol. Four 2
Date: May 23, 20232023.05.16 MSJ - Index of Evidence Vol. Four 3
Date: May 25, 202376789Notic00160c
Date: June 02, 202376790Notic00e4a3
Date: June 02, 202377149Notic00ee77
Date: June 09, 202377224Amend00224f
Date: June 12, 202377225Amend00209f
Date: June 12, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance - DDH-RHR
Date: July 25, 20232023.07.25 Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: July 25, 2023Clampett MSC Brief
Date: July 26, 20232023.07.26 Def MSC Brief
Date: July 26, 20232023.08.07 Ex Parte App to Trail Trial
Date: August 07, 2023Plaintiffs Separate Statement
Date: August 07, 2023Compendium of Exhibits
Date: August 07, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 07, 2023Opposition (Final)
Date: August 07, 2023Evidentiary Objections
Date: August 07, 2023POS
Date: August 07, 2023Evidentiary Objections
Date: August 08, 2023Proposed Order
Date: August 07, 2023Notice of Entry of Order
Date: August 08, 2023Decl DDH ISO OPP ExParteAPP
Date: August 14, 2023Proof of Service
Date: August 14, 2023OPP ExParteApp to Trail Trial Start etc.
Date: August 14, 2023Notice of Entry of Dismissal
Date: November 09, 20232023.08.16 MSJ - Reply Pltfs Opp
Date: August 16, 20232023.08.16 MSJ - Reply Pltfs Objs and Evidence
Date: August 16, 20232023.08.16 MSJ - Objection to Moriarty Decl
Date: August 16, 20232023.08.16 Ntc Entry of Order re Cont Trial
Date: August 16, 20232023.09.13 NOR Notice of Ruling MSJ
Date: September 14, 20232023.09.13 Proposed Order re MSJ
Date: September 22, 20232023.09.26 Reply to Pltf Obj Prop Order MSJ
Date: September 26, 2023Notice of Settlement of Entire Case
Date: October 04, 2023Request for Dismissal - Signed DDH
Date: November 08, 2023Cover sheet.- PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Signed DDH | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal: Full | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice: Settlement | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.09.26 Reply to Pltf Obj Prop Order MSJ | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.09.13 Proposed Order re MSJ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.