Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) case represented by Haley, Jennifer Allison, against Thompson, Lisa Ann, represented by Abernethy, Ronald Hayes, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Mark Boessenecker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conference: Settlement
Judge: Ortiz, Elia |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Diversion Pur to PC 1001.95-1001.97 Judge: Ortiz, Elia |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition or Objections To Motion for Dismiss and Motion for Pretrial Diversion PC1001.95. |
|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conference: Settlement
Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion: Criminal/Traffic/Juv Del for Diversion PC1001.95-1001.97 |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conference: Settlement
Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Boessenecker, Mark |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Public Defender Referral |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.