Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Egan, Gerad Denis, against Hogan, Sean Wade, represented by Akbari, Tabasum, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Ash, Carol presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAsh, Carol Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Arraignment: Complaint
Date: June 03, 2021Arraignment: Complaint
Date: June 09, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: June 29, 2021Sentencing Hearing
Date: July 30, 2021Release Order
Date: July 30, 2021Further Proceedings
Date: August 02, 2021Sentencing Hearing
Date: September 08, 2021Further Proceedings
Date: September 01, 2021Sentencing Hearing
Date: October 06, 2021Violation of Probation
Date: October 13, 2021Violation of Probation
Date: October 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report Credit/Fines
Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Right to Confront And Cross Examine Witnesses | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Found Plea Knowledgeable; Intelligently Made Voluntary | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified by Clerk of the Court | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Defense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Privilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Right to Trial by Jury Waived | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Charges and Direct Consequence of Plea | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Sentencing Hearing Judge: Ash, Carol |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.