Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Compton, Misty, Egan, Gerad Denis, against Valadez, Emanuel Tamayo, represented by Akbari, Tabasum, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Ash, Carol presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAsh, Carol Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 24, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Arraignment: Warrant
Date: June 03, 2021Request
Date: May 26, 2021Arraignment: Complaint
Date: June 09, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: July 08, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: August 20, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: August 16, 2021Pre-Preliminary
Date: August 30, 2021Order
Date: September 03, 2021Arraignment: Warrant - Video
Date: October 04, 2021Sentencing Hearing
Date: October 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Sentencing Hearing Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Orders | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Prohibited Person Relinquishment Form Findings | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Firearms Relinquishment Hearing
Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other Documents Not Listed Notice |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Firearms Relinquishment Hearing
Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Sentencing Hearing Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report Credit/Fines
Judge: Ash, Carol |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment: Warrant - Video Judge: Lo, Paul |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report Credit/Fines
Judge: Ash, Carol |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.