Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Romo Nataly, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case represented by Perez Luis A., against Reyes Marlene, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Compton with Karen Ackerson Gauff presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Harassment Prevention (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseCompton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 29, 2021 | Hearing |
in Department 1, Gauff, Karen Ackerson, Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution Judge: Gauff Karen Ackerson |
|
December 29, 2021 | Hearing |
Department 1 at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220 Restraining Order Hearing |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response - Civil Harassment (non-violence) Filed by Respondent |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response - Civil Harassment Filed by Respondent |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Court Order Fee Waiver - Hearing Set FW003 (Granted ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Denied ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.