Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Zamora Cosme Leonel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cardenas Kimberly, represented by Johns Saddie Tetney, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Compton with Connie R. Quinones presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCompton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order - Court Appointed Counsel Child/Minor Filed by Other |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Respondent |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order as Order After Hearing | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 1, Kim, Esther P., Presiding Request for Order Hearing - Held - Order Made Request for Order Hearing - Held - Order Made Judge: Kim Esther P. |
|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration (Declaration ) Filed by Child |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Child |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 1, Kim, Esther P., Presiding Request for Order Hearing - Held - Continued Request for Order Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Kim Esther P. |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.