Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Chavez, Adam Joel, represented by Navarrete, Carlos Javier, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Michael J. Reinhart presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings (Pre) Re:
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Violation of Pretrial Release Monitoring (VPRAI)
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Pretrial Release Violation Report (VPRAI) | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.