Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Paniaguaflores, Tomas, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Steven D. Barnes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 Effective 01/01/2022 | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Warrant of Arrest - Issued | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment
Judge: Barnes, Steven |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Return Mail Received | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear for Arraignment | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support for a Warrant of Arrest | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.