Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ortega, Alfred Ralph, represented by Ryan, John Patrick, Wippert , Scott Shay, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Michael J. Reinhart presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedMay 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference and Preliminary Hearing Setting
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing
Judge: Burns, Robert Shane |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 Effective 01/01/2022 | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.