Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Romero, Chepe, represented by Taylor, Jason D., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Kathy Ciuffini presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 20 Day Collection Notice | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 Effective 01/01/2022 | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript (Type: Sentencing) | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Out of Custody | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment
Judge: Ciuffini, Kathy |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea form per 14601VC and | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support for a Warrant of Arrest |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.