Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hernandez, Pete Delacruz, represented by Benninghoff, Melina S, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Randy L. Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandy L. Edwards Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2022 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedApril 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.