Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Saldivar, Elias, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald J Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2021 |
CategoryPost Release Community Supervision |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2022 |
Department R19 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Libutti, Michael R |
||
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Parole Notified | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Referred to County Mental Health Director for placement | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Claim Received, Verified and Forwarded to Financial Services DR. BERG/ HRG 03/15/22 |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Copy Sent: OF MEDICAL REPORT FROM DR. BERG TO DA/PD |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Copy Sent: OF 01/25/22 MO TO DR. BERG |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Sent MEDICAL PACKET TO DR GENE BERG |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Doctor notfied via email | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filed in Courtroom: Medical Report from Dr. David M. Walsh |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Doctor notfied via email DR. DAVID WALSH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.