Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of America N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Song Bora, against Ripoli Jessica Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Tricia J. Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Declaration Declaration of Interest; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: October 18, 2022Declaration Declaration RE: CCP 1033; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: October 18, 2022Declaration Declaration of Non Military Service; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Default entered as to Jessica Michelle Ripoli; On the Complaint filed by Bank of America, N.A. on
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Jessica Michelle Ripoli (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: March 23, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 23, 2021Complaint - Complaint
Date: March 23, 2021Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service
Date: April 13, 2021Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 03, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration RE: CCP 1033
Date: October 18, 2022Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Non Military Service
Date: October 18, 2022Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Interest
Date: October 18, 2022Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: October 20, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.