Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Forwardline Financial Llc. A California Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Blanda Jon O, against Sukkert Sathapat, Thaitanium Performance Llc. An Illinois Limited Liability Company Dba Thaitanium Performance, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Tricia J. Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2021 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: SATHAPAT SUKKERT (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: FORWARDLINE FINANCIAL, LLC., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: FORWARDLINE FINANCIAL, LLC., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Complaint - Complaint
Date: February 01, 2021Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: February 01, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 01, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: February 01, 2021Answer - Answer
Date: May 13, 2021Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial
Date: May 13, 2021Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney
Date: September 08, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Hanna Kerfan
Date: October 20, 2021Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 20, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Hanna Kerfan, ESQ.
Date: October 26, 2021Notice of Lodging (name extension) - Notice of Lodging .
Date: October 26, 2021Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 26, 2021Order (name extension) - Order on Ex Parte Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: November 04, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date)
Date: November 04, 2021Notice (name extension) - Notice of Ruling
Date: March 08, 2022Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Initial Responses to Plaintiff's ...)
Date: February 28, 2022Exhibit List - Exhibit List
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial
Date: March 15, 2022Trial Brief - Trial Brief
Date: March 15, 2022Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: April 06, 2022Judgment - Judgment
Date: April 21, 2022Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: May 20, 2022Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: SATHAPAT SUKKERT (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.