Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jordan D Wilson, against Petkov Galin Y, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Tricia J. Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2021 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Updated -- Order order: Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Declaration of Christopher D. Anderson; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Summary of the Case; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: February 22, 2023Complaint; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: GALIN Y PETKOV (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Declaration Re: Publishing the Summons; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Declaration of Angelika Sidoruk in support; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Default entered as to GALIN Y PETKOV; On the Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Declaration RE: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Request to continue and declaration re order to show cause; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: GALIN Y PETKOV (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: January 28, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF VENUE
Date: January 28, 2021Complaint - Complaint
Date: January 28, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 28, 2021Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: March 16, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration IN SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
Date: November 01, 2021Order for Publication - Order for Publication
Date: November 01, 2021Application for Publication - Application for Publication
Date: November 01, 2021Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 11, 2022Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication
Date: January 14, 2022Request (name extension) - Request to continue and declaration re order to show cause
Date: January 11, 2022Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)
Date: February 03, 2022Order (name extension) - Order order
Date: February 08, 2022Application for Publication - Application for Publication
Date: May 06, 2022Application for Publication - Application for Publication
Date: June 09, 2022Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Publishing the Summons
Date: June 09, 2022Application for Publication - Application for Publication
Date: June 15, 2022Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Angelika Sidoruk in support
Date: June 15, 2022Application for Publication - Application for Publication
Date: August 30, 2022Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Christopher D. Anderson
Date: August 30, 2022Order for Publication - Order for Publication
Date: September 13, 2022Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication
Date: October 21, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: February 22, 2023Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees
Date: February 22, 2023Summary of the Case - Summary of the Case
Date: February 22, 2023Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033
Date: February 22, 2023Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS
Date: February 22, 2023Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: February 27, 2023Request to continue and declaration re order to show cause; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: GALIN Y PETKOV (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: GALIN Y PETKOV (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.