Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
James Elox, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Carmen Velazquez, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Minute Order
Date: July 20, 2021Declaration: In Support
Date: June 29, 2021Stipulation
Date: October 26, 2021Minute Order
Date: September 01, 2021Minute Order
Date: September 16, 2021Minute Order
Date: October 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice: New Hearing Date & Order on Reissuance (w/ Amended CH-110) *there is no court date scheduled for this matter. the tro shall expire on 04/25/2022 |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation re: continuance of TRO for six months |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 25, 2021 | Hearing | Court Trial: Short Cause | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice: New Hearing Date & Order on Reissuance | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 16, 2021 | Hearing | Court Trial: Short Cause | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice: New Hearing Date & Order on Reissuance | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 01, 2021 | Hearing | Court Trial: Short Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.