Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mercedes Mairena, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Daisy Montes, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Stipulation
Date: March 09, 2021Declaration: In Support
Date: January 20, 2021Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV
Date: March 09, 2021Minute Order
Date: March 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge for All Purposes |
|
March 09, 2021 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Response |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Response: Petition Civil Harassment/Workplace Violence | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Personal Ntc of Hrg, Requeset, TRO |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration: In Support | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Request: Restraining Order | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order: Temporary Restraining Order GRANTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.