Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Luna Olea, Lucas, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArax, Brian M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 10, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person Only |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings
Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint Guardian Petition for Appointment of Guardian Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of C.I. report |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Confidential Supplemental Court Investigation Report Fee waived |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Consent, Nomination and Waiver of Notice Consent: Conifacio Luna Moreno Nomination: Waiver of notice of hearing: Bonifacio Luna Moreno (Proposed Guardian) Lucas Luna Olea (Minor) |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Date:2/23/22 Time:9am Department:303 |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Date: 2/23/22 Time: 9am Dept: 303 |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice Mailed |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Consent, Nomination and Waiver of Notice GC-211_LUNA OLEA, Lucas |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Consent, Nomination and Waiver of Notice Waiver: Zerafin Moreno, Flora Torres, Juana Moreno |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.