Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Straugh, Donna Lee, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArax, Brian M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing RE: Filing of the First Account or Final Account
Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance Via Zoom | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal
Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Report and Request for Continuance of Probate Status Hearing | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Probate Order Appointing Executor, Order Authorizing IAEA with Full Authority Judge: Cardoza, Jane |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letters (Estates) Letters Testamentary cc mailed |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Will Filed | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary, Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA Judge: Cardoza, Jane |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Calendar Setting |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice Mailed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.