Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Arnold, Sherryl, filed a(n) Spousal Property - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2021 |
CategorySpousal Property Petition |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeSpousal Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Petition (Initial) Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice Mailed |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing on Petition to Determine Claim to Property | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Petition (Initial) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.