Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Quinn, Cheryl, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship - Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator Judge: Cardoza, Jane |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance Via Zoom | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Hrg: 5/31/2022; Proof of Service |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Confidential Capacity Declaration | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice Mailed |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance Via Zoom | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Report | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice Mailed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.