Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Fresno, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Redmond, Derwoyne A, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Noelle E. Pebet presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2021 |
CategoryDafs |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Child Support
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - Joinder
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Entry of Judgment
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
General Motion Parentage Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - Health Care
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Entry of Judgment; Child Support; Health Care; Join Other Parent; Parentage. Hrg: 12/20/2021 1:15 p.m. Dept. 301 |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Comment Rejected the unsigned electronically Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment and Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations submitted. Reason provided: According to the Court's records there was an Answer filed. |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer Filed Family Support | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the Answer was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on 09.23.2021 . Parties served: Fresno County DCSS P.O. Box 12946 Fresno, CA 93779-2946 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.