Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Fresno, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Madrigal, Gilberto, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Pebet, Noelle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
CategoryDafs |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - Joinder
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Commissioner Pebet minute order. See attached | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - Health Care
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
General Motion Parentage Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - Genetic Test
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Entry of Judgment
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Child Support
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail on 7.28.21 on Gilberto Madrigal, Mayra Zamora of NOM/Judg-CS, HC, Parentage, genetic testing & Join other parent Hrg date 09.21.2021 at 08:00 am in Dept. 301, Notice of Calendar Setting filed 07.27.2021 w/Zoom info and important instructions for Zoom Hrgs | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Entry of Judgment; Child Support; Health Care; Parentage; Join Other Parent; Genetic Testing. Hrg: 09/21/2021 8:00 a.m. Dept. 301 |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer Filed Family Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.