Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Fresno, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Lopez, Marcelo R, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Noelle E. Pebet presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2021 |
CategoryDafs |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - Health Care
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Child Support
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - Joinder Parent Joinder Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Commissioner Hamilton Minute Order. See attached. | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
General Motion Parentage Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Entry of Judgment
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Date mailed: 7/6/21 Served: Marcelo Lopez & Blanca Cerrato |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Entry of Judgment, Child Support, Healthcare, Parentage and Parent Joinder / HRG: 8/9/2021 @1:15pm Dept 301 |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer Filed Family Support | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint by personal service on 5/25/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.