Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chaparro, Kevin James, Jr, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Chaparro, Julieanna, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Lisa M. Gamoian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa M. Gamoian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution - Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
2 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reissuance of OSC
Judge: Hopper, Cindy |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order-Orders electronically mailed MO of 8/23/22, OSC reissuance sent to resp jewelsc121410@gmail |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Petitioner served by mail on 8/30/22 |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reissuance OSC/TRO Last Hearing: 08-23-22 Reissued Hearing to: 11-01-22 @ 1:30 pm in Dept 203 |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Appeared in Person | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Commissioner Hopper Minute Order: See Attached | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
General Motion 2107 Waiver and Bifurcation Judge: Hopper, Cindy |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Petitioner served by mail on 7/7/22 |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.