Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lopez, Chasity, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Lopez, Tizoc, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Hopper, Cindy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2021 |
CategoryPetition Custody And Support |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return Readiness- Tier I
Judge: Hamilton, Jennifer |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
FCS Session Set Tier I |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Reissued
Judge: Hamilton, Jennifer |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order-Orders electronically mailed and DV-116 |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reissuance OSC/TRO Last Hearing: 11/2/22 Reissued Hearing to: 12/21/22 |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Commissioner Hopper Minute Order: See Attached | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Appeared in Person | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing w/o Temp Restrng Order
Judge: Hopper, Cindy |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Denied Domestic Violence |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.