Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Luna, Mayra, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Luna, Jehovan, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Gamoian, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing To Rspnt- MO/ DV130/ CO |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge Gamoian Minute Order: See Attached Dept 304 08:58am Judge: L Gamoian Clerk: M Quiroz Reporter: J Hannickel Petitioner: Present/ Sworn/ ProPer (Zoom) Respondent: Not Present Hrg type: Hrg w/o TRO Other: Court is satisfied respondent was served. There was notice and opportunity to be heard and respondent is not present on today's date. Court will proceed in his absence. After considering the original request for Order, Court finds acts of abuse were prepretrated against petitioner and will issue a restraining order for the duration of 3 years. Petitioner is the only protected person. If the protected party wishes to renew the restraining order, a request must be filed within 3 months before the date of expiration. The Court grants the mother sole legal and sole physical custody of the 3 minor children: Ezra I Luna Betancourt DOB 12/17/2014, Jeremiah Luna Betancourt DOB 03/08/2016, and Miriam Luna Betancourt DOB 11/01/2018. The father shall have no visitation pending further order of the court. Restraining Orders (CLETS): The Restrained person is: JEHOVAN LUNA The Protected person is: MAYRA LUNA Personal Conduct Orders: The restrained person must not do the following things to the protected people listed in this paperwork: a. harass, attack, strike, threaten, assault (sexually or otherwise), hit follow, stalk, molest, destroy personal property, disturb the peace, keep under surveillance, or block movements b. Contact (either directly or indirectly), telephone, or send messages, or mail or e-mail c. Take any action, directly or through others, to get the addresses or locations of any protected persons or of their Family members, caretakers, or guardians. (If item C is not checked, the Court has found good cause not to make this order.) Peaceful written contact through a lawyer or through a process server or another person in order to serve legal papers is allowed and does not violate this order. Stay-Away Order The person restrained must stay at least 100 yards away from the protected person and: Home; Vehicle; School of protected person; The job or workplace of protected person Child Custody and Visitation Child custody and visitation are ordered on the attached Form DV-140 or (specify other form): See Child Custody order filed 03/18/2021 Expires on: 03/18/2024 at Midnight If no date of expiration, Order expires 3 years from the date of hearing. |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order-Orders electronically mailed DV130 & CO |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing w/o Temp Restrng Order
Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Child Custody and Visitation Order Signed by Judge | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (DV-200) Personal Service |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Denied Domestic Violence w/ zoom |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Return Letter | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Application and Declaration for Order DV - w/ Minor Children |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.