Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Perez, Monica, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Torres, Marcos, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Amy K. Guerra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence - No Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing w/o Temp Restrng Order
Judge: Guerra, Amy |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge Guerra minute order. See attached. Minute Order from Dept: 204 at 08:39 am Judge: A Guerra Clerk: J. Bernal Reporter: M. Kazarian Petitioner Present/Pro Per - Zoom Respondent Present/Pro Per - courtroom Nature of Hearing: Hrg w/o TRO Continued to 06/04/2021 at 8:30 am in Dept. 204 Issues: TRO Reissued There is no proper proof of service in the Court's file. Respondent waives defective service. Respondent is advised by the court of his rights to a one time continuance. Respondent requests to continue the matter. Court grants the continuance. If respondent files a response, he must file 10 days before the court hearing date and serve to petitioner. There is no temporary restraining order in place. |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reissuance OSC/TRO Last Hearing: 05-07-2021 Reissued Hearing to: 06-04-2021 |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order-Orders electronically mailed | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing w/o Temp Restrng Order
Judge: Guerra, Amy |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of service via Facebook with attachment | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge Guerra minute order. See attached. Dept: 204 Judge: A. Guerra Clerk: M. Rivera Reporter: M. Kazarian Petitioner: Present/Pro per-Zoom Respondent: Not Present Hearing type: OSC Hrg w/o TRO Reissd There is no proper proof of service in the Court's file. Court will reissue the Temporary Restraining Order 45-60 days out. A new Court date was obtained from the Clerk's Office today and must be served within (5) days of the new date that is given. A copy of the original Temporary Restraining Order along with the Request and Order to Continue Hearing Orders must be served timely. No temporary restraining orders were granted in this case. Today's minute order will be emailed to filing party. |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reissuance OSC/TRO Last Hearing: 03/19/2021 Reissued Hearing to: 05/07/2021 |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing w/o Temp Restrng Order
Judge: Guerra, Amy |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order-Orders electronically mailed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.